DC B23-0637 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-27 - Act A23-0490 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13909
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-27 - Act A23-0490 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13909
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 23-637 would expand the lots which the Mayor is authorized to acquire via the exercise of the eminent domain, for the purposes of warehousing and storage for government equipment, records, property, and supplies.
Title
Warehousing and Storage Eminent Domain Authority Act of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-20 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-10-06 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-10-06 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-27 | Council | Act A23-0490 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13909 |
2020-11-17 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-11-16 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0490 |
2020-11-02 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on November 17, 2020 |
2020-10-20 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-10-06 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2020-09-29 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-09-17 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0637 |
2020-03-10 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2020-02-21 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-02-07 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0637 Published in the DC Register |
2020-02-04 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2020-01-28 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |