DC B23-0634 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-06 - Act A23-0238, Expires on May 27, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 2525
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modification Nos. 7, 7a, And 8 To Contract No. Cw56525 With Great American Corporation Dba Dutch Mill Catering Approval And Payment Authorization Emergency Act Of 2020

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modification Nos. 7, 7a, And 8 To Contract No. Cw56525 With Great American Corporation Dba Dutch Mill Catering Approval And Payment Authorization Emergency Act Of 2020

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-04 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-06CouncilAct A23-0238, Expires on May 27, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 2525
2020-02-27CouncilSigned with Act Number A23-0238
2020-02-27CouncilEnacted with Act Number A23-0238
2020-02-14CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on March 2, 2020
2020-02-04CouncilFinal Reading
2020-02-04CouncilRetained by the Council
2020-01-28CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback