DC B23-0597 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-07 - Act A23-0214 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 1110, Expires on Apr 28, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-07 - Act A23-0214 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 1110, Expires on Apr 28, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Closing of Public Street and Alley Abutting Squares 3765 and 3767 Emergency Act of 2020
Title
Closing of Public Street and Alley Abutting Squares 3765 and 3767 Emergency Act of 2020
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-07 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-07 | Council | Act A23-0214 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 1110, Expires on Apr 28, 2020 |
2020-01-29 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-01-29 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0214, Expires on Apr 28, 2020 |
2020-01-21 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2020-01-14 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 29, 2020 |
2020-01-07 | Council | Final Reading |
2020-01-06 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |