DC B23-0567 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on January 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-20 - Law L23-0059, Effective from Mar 10, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 3074, Expires on Oct 21, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Access to Body Worn Camera Footage Temporary Amendment Act of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Access to Body Worn Camera Footage Temporary Amendment Act of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-12-17 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-03 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-20CouncilLaw L23-0059, Effective from Mar 10, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 3074, Expires on Oct 21, 2020
2020-01-27CouncilTransmitted to Congress
2020-01-24CouncilAct A23-0191 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 566
2020-01-17CouncilReturned from Mayor
2020-01-16CouncilSigned by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0191
2020-01-06CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 21, 2020
2019-12-17CouncilFinal Reading, CC
2019-12-10CouncilRetained by the Council
2019-12-03CouncilFirst Reading
2019-12-03CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback