DC B23-0564 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-15 - Law L23-0092, Effective from May 06, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 5013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-15 - Law L23-0092, Effective from May 06, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 5013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
LEGISLATIVE SUMMARY - Law 23-92 repeals the Freedom Forum Tax Relief Act, terminating the existing Land Use Restriction Agreement on the Property designated as Lots 826 and 831 in Square 491 which is where the soon to close Newseum is located.
Title
Modification of the Freedom Forum, Inc. Real Property Tax Exemption and Equitable Real Property Tax Relief Act of 2004 Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-15 | Council | Law L23-0092, Effective from May 06, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 5013 |
2020-03-27 | Council | Act A23-0258 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 3520 |
2020-03-25 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2020-03-18 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-03-17 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0258 |
2020-03-09 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on March 23, 2020 |
2020-03-03 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-02-04 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2020-01-24 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-01-16 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0564 |
2020-01-02 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-12-13 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-12-06 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0564 Published in the DC Register |
2019-12-03 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2019-12-02 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |