DC B23-0534 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on November 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-29 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-29 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 23-534 requires hospitals, health care facilities and testing centers to provide notice regarding the danger of receiving inaccurate results to early testing for Lyme disease.
Title
Lyme Disease Testing Information Disclosure Act of 2019
Sponsors
Cnc. Brandon Todd [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Jack Evans [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] |
Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-29 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2020-07-10 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-07-06 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-06-04 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-12-06 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-11-15 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0534 Published in the DC Register |
2019-11-05 | Council | Referred to Committee on Health |
2019-11-05 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B23-0534 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/43556/Introduction/B23-0534-Introduction.pdf |