DC B23-0496 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on October 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-10 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-10 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 23-496 requires the State Superintendent of Education and public schools and public charter schools to provide 7th grade students with information about the application criteria and admissions process for citywide selective high schools. It allows the top 15% of 8th grade students in every public school or public charter school to apply to citywide selective high schools. It prohibits the consideration of standardized test scores in its application criteria.
Title
Fair Access to Selective High Schools Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. Trayon White [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] |
Cnc. David Grosso [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2020-01-31 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2020-01-24 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-10-18 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0496 Published in the DC Register |
2019-10-08 | Council | Referred to Committee on Education |
2019-10-08 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B23-0496 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/43375/Introduction/B23-0496-Introduction.pdf |