DC B23-0467 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-15 - Law L23-0081, Effective from Apr 16, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 5003
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-15 - Law L23-0081, Effective from Apr 16, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 5003
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
LEGISLATIVE SUMMARY - Law 23-81 allows for the administration of medical marijuana, in non-smokable form, at a school if a student is a qualifying patient and failure to administer medical marijuana during the school day would disrupt the student's ability to participate in school instruction.
Title
Student Medical Marijuana Patient Fairness Amendment Act of 2019 (now known as "Student Access to Treatment Amendment Act of 2020")
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-07 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-07 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-07 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-07 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-15 | Council | Law L23-0081, Effective from Apr 16, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 5003 |
2020-03-06 | Council | Act A23-0227 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 2498 |
2020-03-05 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2020-02-28 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-02-27 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0227 |
2020-02-18 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on March 3, 2020 |
2020-02-04 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-01-07 | Council | Amendment (Mendelson) |
2020-01-07 | Council | First Reading |
2019-12-11 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2019-12-10 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0467 |
2019-12-06 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2019-12-05 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0467 |
2019-11-13 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-10-18 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-10-11 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0467 Published in the DC Register |
2019-10-08 | Council | Referred to Committee on Health |
2019-10-04 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |