DC B23-0438 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on September 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-06 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-06 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 23-438 provides qualified small local businesses with a tax credit for a portion of rent or property taxes paid and to reduce the taxable value of commercial property if it is rented or owned by a qualifying small local business.
Title
Small and Local Business Assistance Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. Brandon Todd [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] |
Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] | Cnc. Jack Evans [D] | Cnc. Trayon White [D] | Cnc. David Grosso [D] |
Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-06 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-10-18 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-09-27 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0438 Published in the DC Register |
2019-09-17 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2019-09-17 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B23-0438 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/43172/Introduction/B23-0438-Introduction.pdf |