DC B23-0419 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on October 21 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-17 - Law L23-0038, Effective from Dec 24, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 286, Expires on Aug 05, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on October 21 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-17 - Law L23-0038, Effective from Dec 24, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 286, Expires on Aug 05, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Education Research Practice Partnership Technical Temporary Amendment Act of 2019
Title
Education Research Practice Partnership Technical Temporary Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-10-08 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-17 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-17 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-17 | Council | Law L23-0038, Effective from Dec 24, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 286, Expires on Aug 05, 2020 |
2019-11-08 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2019-11-08 | Council | Act A23-0156 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 14814 |
2019-11-05 | Council | Enacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A23-0156 |
2019-11-04 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2019-10-21 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on November 4, 2019 |
2019-10-08 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2019-10-08 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-09-17 | Council | First Reading |
2019-09-16 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |