DC B23-0418 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on September 23 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-11 - Act A23-0127 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 13164, Expires on Jan 06, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on September 23 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-11 - Act A23-0127 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 13164, Expires on Jan 06, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Education Research Practice Partnership Technical Emergency Amendment Act of 2019
Title
Education Research Practice Partnership Technical Emergency Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-17 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-11 | Council | Act A23-0127 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 13164, Expires on Jan 06, 2020 |
2019-10-08 | Council | Enacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A23-0127, Expires on Jan 06, 2020 |
2019-10-08 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-10-07 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2019-09-23 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on October 7, 2019 |
2019-09-17 | Council | Final Reading |
2019-09-16 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |