DC B23-0404 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-26 - Law L23-0083, Effective from May 05, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 7840
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-26 - Law L23-0083, Effective from May 05, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 7840
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
LEGISLATIVE SUMMARY - Law 23-83 provides the Deputy Mayor for Planning and Economic Development with authority to issue a grant to enable the acquisition of a facility in historic Anacostia, at 1920 Martin Luther King Jr. Ave, S.E., Washington, D.C., 20020, which will serve as an educational and resource center for at-risk youth.
Title
Deputy Mayor for Planning and Economic Development Limited Grant Making Authority for Check IT Enterprises Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-26 | Council | Law L23-0083, Effective from May 05, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 7840 |
2020-03-24 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2020-03-20 | Council | Act A23-0244 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 3082 |
2020-03-12 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-03-11 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0244 |
2020-03-09 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on March 23, 2020 |
2020-03-03 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-02-04 | Council | First Reading |
2020-02-04 | Council | Amendment (Mendelson) |
2019-12-19 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2019-12-18 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0404 |
2019-11-06 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-10-18 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-09-17 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2019-07-19 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0404 Published in the DC Register |
2019-07-11 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |