DC B23-0399 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on July 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-23 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-23 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced it requires the Mayor to prohibit activities that may compromise the retaining wall commonly known as the O Street Wall or contribute to soil erosion and sedimentation in Square S-5542, S.E.
Title
O Street Wall Protection Act of 2019
Sponsors
Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. David Grosso [D] | Cnc. Brandon Todd [D] |
Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Jack Evans [D] | Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] | Cnc. Robert White [D] |
Cnc. Phil Mendelson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-23 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-12-27 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-07-19 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0399 Published in the DC Register |
2019-07-09 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2019-07-09 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B23-0399 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/43049/Introduction/B23-0399-Introduction.pdf |