DC B23-0391 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on July 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-10-30 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced it establishes a Public Housing Rehabilitation Oversight Task Force to review the rehabilitation of District public housing properties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Housing Rehabilitation Oversight Task Force Act Of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-30CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2019-09-13CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-07-19CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0391 Published in the DC Register
2019-07-09CouncilReferred to Committee on Housing and Neighborhood Revitalization
2019-07-09CouncilIntroduced in Committee of the Whole

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback