DC B23-0345 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-26 - Act A23-0090 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 8495, Expires on Oct 20, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-26 - Act A23-0090 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 8495, Expires on Oct 20, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifications to Contract No. CW47432 with Community Connections, Inc. Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2019
Title
Modifications to Contract No. CW47432 with Community Connections, Inc. Approval and Payment Authorization Emergency Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-25 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-26 | Council | Act A23-0090 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 8495, Expires on Oct 20, 2019 |
2019-07-22 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2019-07-22 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0090, Expires on Oct 20, 2019 |
2019-07-08 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 22, 2019 |
2019-06-25 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2019-06-25 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-06-17 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |