DC B23-0336 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on August 20 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-15 - Law L23-0026, Effective from Oct 24, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 15182, Expires on Jun 05, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on August 20 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-15 - Law L23-0026, Effective from Oct 24, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 15182, Expires on Jun 05, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Medical Marijuana Program Patient Employment Protection Temporary Amendment Act of 2019
Title
Medical Marijuana Program Patient Employment Protection Temporary Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-07-09 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-15 | Council | Law L23-0026, Effective from Oct 24, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 15182, Expires on Jun 05, 2020 |
2019-09-13 | Council | Act A23-0114 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 12086 |
2019-09-11 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2019-09-05 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2019-09-05 | Council | Enacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A23-0114 |
2019-08-20 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on September 4, 2019 |
2019-07-09 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2019-06-25 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-06-21 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0336 Published in the DC Register |
2019-06-18 | Council | First Reading |
2019-06-18 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |