DC B23-0309 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on December 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Act A23-0540 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 00048
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced it prohibits the District of Columbia government from discriminating, in employment, against individuals participating in the medical marijuana program. FUNDING NOTE - This bill is "Subject to Appropriations"; please see Fiscal Impact Statement under Other Documents.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medical Marijuana Program Patient Employment Protection Amendment Act of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-12-01 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-11-10 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-01CouncilAct A23-0540 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 00048
2020-12-23CouncilReturned from Mayor
2020-12-17CouncilSigned by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0540
2020-12-08CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 22, 2020
2020-12-01CouncilFinal Reading, CC
2020-11-10CouncilFirst Reading, CC
2020-10-27CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2020-10-27CouncilCommittee Mark-up of B23-0309
2019-09-25CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2019-06-21CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-06-07CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0309 Published in the DC Register
2019-05-28CouncilReferred to Committee on Labor and Workforce Development
2019-05-28CouncilIntroduced in Committee of the Whole

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback