DC B23-0292 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on May 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-24 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-24 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced it requires the installation of curb extensions to reduce pedestrian crossing distances when the District performs reconstructions and repavings of roadways.
Title
Curb Extensions Act of 2019
Sponsors
Cnc. David Grosso [D] | Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] | Cnc. Brandon Todd [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] |
Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Trayon White [D] |
Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-24 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-10-04 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-09-20 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-09-06 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-05-10 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0292 Published in the DC Register |
2019-05-07 | Council | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment |
2019-05-07 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B23-0292 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/42526/Introduction/B23-0292-Introduction.pdf |