DC B23-0288 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on November 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-15 - Law L23-0158, Effective from Dec 23, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 000732
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on November 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-15 - Law L23-0158, Effective from Dec 23, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 000732
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced the bill requires 10 days' notice regarding statements about regulating vehicular or pedestrian traffic, if the proposed installation, modification, or removal of the statement will increase safety at a location identified as a high-risk intersection in the Multimodal Long-Range Transportation Plan. It requires the Mayor to install sidewalks on both sides of a street, to connect new sidewalks to existing sidewalks and to mark unmarked crosswalks. It provides that the Department of Transportation (DDOT) not issue public space permits for certain projects unless the plans include installing new sidewalks, bicycle lanes or cycle tracks, or marked crosswalks and the applicant has met the requirements of previous permits and returned crosswalks and bicycle lanes to their pre-construction condition. It also requires that DDOT make certain information publicly available and easily searchable, and issue reports on how projects or recommendations increase transportation safety and provide equitable access to safety goals. Among other things, it requires Council approval of the Multimodal Long-Range Transportation Plan.
FUNDING NOTE - This bill is Subject to Appropriations. See Fiscal Impact Statement.
Title
Vision Zero Enhancement Omnibus Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-09-22 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-21 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-21 - Council - Amendment (Nadeau) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Council - Amendment (Cheh) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Council - Amendment (Cheh and Todd) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-07-21 - Council - Amendment (Nadeau) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Council - Amendment (Cheh) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Council - Amendment (Cheh and Todd) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-15 | Council | Law L23-0158, Effective from Dec 23, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 000732 |
2020-11-06 | Council | Act A23-0451 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 13057 |
2020-11-05 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2020-11-02 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-11-02 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0451 |
2020-10-20 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on November 3, 2020 |
2020-09-22 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-07-21 | Council | Amendment (Cheh and Todd) |
2020-07-21 | Council | First Reading |
2020-07-21 | Council | Amendment (Nadeau) |
2020-07-21 | Council | Amendment (Cheh) |
2020-07-13 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-07-10 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0288 |
2019-10-24 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-10-04 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-09-20 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-09-06 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-05-10 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0288 Published in the DC Register |
2019-05-07 | Council | Referred to Committee on Transportation and the Environment |
2019-05-07 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |