DC B23-0283 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-20 - Law L23-0013, Effective from Aug 24, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 12342, Expires on Apr 05, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-20 - Law L23-0013, Effective from Aug 24, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 12342, Expires on Apr 05, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Fair Elections Temporary Amendment Act of 2019
Title
Fair Elections Temporary Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-04 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-20 | Council | Law L23-0013, Effective from Aug 24, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 12342, Expires on Apr 05, 2020 |
2019-07-15 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2019-07-12 | Council | Act A23-0070 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 8058 |
2019-07-03 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2019-07-01 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0070 |
2019-06-24 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 9, 2019 |
2019-06-04 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2019-05-28 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2019-05-10 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0283 Published in the DC Register |
2019-05-07 | Council | First Reading |
2019-05-07 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |