DC B23-0251 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 14 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-02-14 - Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on March 2, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced it removes from the Plan of Permanent Systems of Highways a portion of 39th Street,

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Abandonment Of The Highway Plan For 39th Street, N.w., S.o. 18-41885 Act Of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-04 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-07 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-14CouncilTransmitted to Mayor, Response Due on March 2, 2020
2020-02-04CouncilFinal Reading CC
2020-02-03CouncilCommittee Report Filed
2020-01-07CouncilFirst Reading CC
2019-12-17CouncilCommittee Mark-up of B23-0251
2019-11-07CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2019-10-18CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-04-23CouncilReferred to Committee on Committee of the Whole
2019-04-12CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0251 Published in the DC Register
2019-04-04CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback