DC B23-0239 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on April 2 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced it establishes an electronic reporting system for all Local Education Agencies (LEAs) and public school budget expenditures to collect comparable data from schools and LEAs. It creates a line-item for at-risk funding for each school and delineates how DCPS and the Public Charter School Board shall delineate costs and expenditures in their budgets. It requires that public charter schools comply with the District of Columbia Administrative Procedures Act and the Office of the State Superintendent of Education is required to create an electronic reporting system for public school expenditures for the public.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School Based Budgeting And Transparency Amendment Act Of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-26CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2019-05-03CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2019-04-05CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0239 Published in the DC Register
2019-04-02CouncilReferred to Committee on Education
2019-04-02CouncilIntroduced in Legislative Meeting

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback