DC B23-0211 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-22 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-22 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced it permits the District of Columbia Public Library to promote, endorse, co-sponsor, solicit for, or collaborate with charitable organizations whose sole mission is to support the public library and engage in revenue-generating activities.
Title
District of Columbia Public Library Partnership and Sponsorship Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-22 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-04-02 | Council | Referred to Committee on Education |
2019-03-29 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-03-29 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0211 Published in the DC Register |
2019-03-19 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B23-0211 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/42122/Introduction/B23-0211-Introduction.pdf |