DC B23-0209 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - First Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amendments moved at the Committee of the Whole may be accessed under the "Other Documents" tab. The PDF referral memo may be accessed under the "Other Documents" tab. The below list notes the committee referrals. The Chairman is referring this legislation to the Committee of the Whole with comments from standing committees on specific subtitles as indicated below: COMMITTEE LEGEND BED BUSINESS AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT COW COMMITTEE OF THE WHOLE E EDUCATION FP FACILITIES AND PROCUREMENT FR FINANCE AND REVENUE GO GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS H HEALTH HNR HOUSING AND NEIGHBORHOOD REVITALIZATION HS HUMAN SERVICES JPS JUDICIARY AND PUBLIC SAFETY LWD LABOR AND WORKFORCE DEVELOPMENT RYA RECREATION AND YOUTH AFFAIRS TE TRANSPORTATION AND THE ENVIRONMENT   TITLE I. GOVERNMENT DIRECTION AND SUPPORT SUBTITLE A. LEASE CONTINGENCY FUND FP SUBTITLE B. ISSUANCE OF MARRIAGE LICENSES DURING A FEDERAL GOVERNMENT SHUTDOWN H, GO, JPS SUBTITLE C. CAPTIVE INSURANCE AGENCY FUND BED TITLE II. ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND REGULATION SUBTITLE A. EXPEDITED BUILDING PERMIT REVIEW PROGRAM FUND COW SUBTITLE B. NEGOTIATED EMPLOYEE AFFORDABLE HOME PURCHASE FUND HNR SUBTITLE C. BRYANT STREET TAX INCREMENT FINANCING BED SUBTITLE D. CHEMONICS TAX ABATEMENT BED SUBTITLE E. QUALIFIED HIGH TECHNOLOGY COMPANIES TAX ABATEMENT AMENDMENT BED, FR SUBTITLE F. DEPUTY MAYOR FOR PLANNING AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT GRANT-MAKING AUTHORITY FOR THE DC CHAMBER OF COMMERCE BED SUBTITLE G. GREAT STREETS GRANTS BED SUBTITLE H. NEW COMMUNITIES BOND ISSUANCES BED SUBTITLE I. OFFICE OF CABLE TELEVISION, FILM, MUSIC, AND ENTERTAINMENT ESTABLISHMENT ACT AMENDMENT BED SUBTITLE J. CULTURAL FACILITIES FUND COW SUBTITLE K. CULTURAL INNOVATION AND ENTREPRENEURSHIP FUND COW SUBTITLE L. DEPARTMENT OF CONSUMER AND REGULATORY AFFAIRS SPECIAL PURPOSE REVENUE FUNDS EXPENDITURE AUTHORITY COW SUBTITLE M. CHIEF TENANT ADVOCATE SALARY HNR SUBTITLE N. SUMMER YOUTH EMPLOYMENT PROGRAM SUPERVISOR WAGES LWD SUBTITLE O. WORKFORCE HOUSING PRODUCTION AND PRESERVATION FUND HNR   TITLE III. PUBLIC SAFETY AND JUSTICE SUBTITLE A. CRIMINAL CODE REFORM COMMISSION TERM EXTENSION JPS SUBTITLE B. SENIOR POLICE OFFICERS PROGRAM AMENDMENT JPS SUBTITLE C. EMERGENCY AND NON-EMERGENCY TELEPHONE CALLING SYSTEMS FUNDING JPS, BED, FR SUBTITLE D. CRIMINAL JUSTICE COORDINATING COUNCIL MEMBERSHIP JPS SUBTITLE E. CRIME VICTIMS COMPENSATION FUNERAL AND BURIAL EXPENSES JPS SUBTITLE F. DEPARTMENT OF FORENSIC SCIENCES SERVICES AND FEES JPS SUBTITLE G. INFORMATION SHARING FOR PROGRAM EVALUATION AND IMPROVEMENT JPS, RYA SUBTITLE H. OFFICE OF NEIGHBORHOOD SAFETY AND ENGAGEMENT FUND AUTHORITY AND TRANSFER OF ROVING LEADERS PROGRAM JPS, RYA TITLE IV. PUBLIC EDUCATION SUBTITLE A. UNIFORM PER STUDENT FUNDING FORMULA FOR PUBLIC SCHOOLS AND PUBLIC CHARTER SCHOOLS INCREASES COW, E SUBTITLE B. OFFICE OF OUT OF SCHOOL TIME FUND COW, E SUBTITLE C. COMMUNITY SCHOOLS ADVISORY COMMITTEE COW, E SUBTITLE D. RECOVERY OF DELINQUENT NON-RESIDENT TUITION PAYMENTS COW, E, FR SUBTITLE E. OFFICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE HEARINGS JURISDICTION COW, E, GO SUBTITLE F. PUBLIC CHARTER SCHOOL CLOSURE CONDITIONS COW, E SUBTITLE G. SUBSIDIZED CHILD CARE E SUBTITLE H. DEPUTY MAYOR FOR EDUCATION LIMITED GRANT-MAKING AUTHORITY COW, E SUBTITLE I. SPECIAL EDUCATION COMPLIANCE FUND COW, E TITLE V. HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES SUBTITLE A. FLEXIBLE RENT SUBSIDY PROGRAM HS SUBTITLE B. DEPARTMENT OF PARKS AND RECREATION PARTNERSHIPS RYA SUBTITLE C. FUNDING STRUCTURE FOR THE COMMISSION ON THE ARTS AND HUMANITIES COW SUBTITLE D. INTERAGENCY COUNCIL ON HOMELESSNESS CONSUMER MEMBER STIPENDS HS SUBTITLE E. HOMELESS SERVICES ELIGIBILITY REDETERMINATION PROCESS HS SUBTITLE F. OFFICE OF VETERANS AFFAIRS GRANT-MAKING AUTHORITY GO SUBTITLE G. ADULT PROTECTIVE SERVICES TRANSFER HS, HNR SUBTITLE H. FAMILIES FIRST DC HS TITLE VI. TRANSPORTATION, PUBLIC WORKS, AND THE ENVIRONMENT SUBTITLE A. HALF STREET, SE, IMPROVEMENT GRANT TE SUBTITLE B. DISTRICT DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION MASTER CAPITAL PROJECTS TE SUBTITLE C. APPEALS OF FINAL DECISIONS OF THE DEPARTMENT OF FOR-HIRE VEHICLES BED, GO SUBTITLE D. DEPARTMENT OF FOR-HIRE VEHICLES CONSUMER SERVICE FUND REPORTING BED SUBTITLE E. PARKING ENFORCEMENT AUTHORITY TE SUBTITLE F. STUDENT, YOUTH, AND LEARNER TRANSIT SUBSIDY PROGRAMS TE, FR, LWD SUBTITLE G. CLEANENERGY DC IMPLEMENTATION TE, BED SUBTITLE H. CLEAN RIVERS IMPERVIOUS AREA CHARGE ASSISTANCE FUND TE TITLE VII. FINANCE AND REVENUE SUBTITLE A. SENIOR RESIDENTS REAL PROPERTY TAX CAP CONFORMITY FOR UNITS IN COOPERATIVE HOUSING ASSOCIATIONS FR SUBTITLE B. KEEP CHILD CARE AFFORDABLE TAX CREDIT FR SUBTITLE C. KEEP HOUSING AFFORDABLE INCREASED TAX RELIEF FR SUBTITLE D. DEED TRANSFER AND RECORDATION TAXES AND FUNDING FOR AFFORDABLE HOUSING FR SUBTITLE E. FISCAL YEAR 2019 INTERNET SALES TAX REVENUE FR, COW SUBTITLE F. COMMERCIAL PROPERTY TAX RATE FR SUBTITLE G. DIAPER SALES TAX EXEMPTION COW SUBTITLE H. SPORTS WAGERING REVENUE FR SUBTITLE I. SUBJECT-TO-APPROPRIATIONS REPEALS AND DELAYS COW TITLE VIII. SPECIAL PURPOSE AND DEDICATED REVENUE FUNDS SUBTITLE A. DESIGNATED FUND TRANSFERS COW

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fiscal Year 2020 Budget Support Act Of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-14 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14CouncilFirst Reading
2019-04-26CouncilOversight Hearing Held
2019-04-02CouncilReferred to Committee on Committee of the Whole
2019-03-29CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B23-0209 Published in the DC Register
2019-03-20CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback