DC B23-0150 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Enrolled on December 8 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-01 - Act A23-0548 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 00115
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on December 8 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-01 - Act A23-0548 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 00115
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced it establishes a dyslexia screening and intervention pilot program for early elementary grades to be implemented by the State Superintendent of Education.
FUNDING NOTE - This bill is Subject to Appropriations. See Fiscal Impact Statement in "Other Documents".
Title
Dyslexia and Other Reading Disabilities Screening and Prevention Pilot Program Act of 2019
Sponsors
Cnc. Brandon Todd [D] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. Jack Evans [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] |
Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Trayon White [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-11-10 - Council - Final Reading, CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-10-20 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-10-20 - Council - First Reading, CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-01 | Council | Act A23-0548 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 00115 |
2020-12-23 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-12-23 | Council | Enacted without Mayor's Signature with Act Number A23-0548 |
2020-12-08 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 22, 2020 |
2020-11-10 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-11-06 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-10-20 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2020-10-20 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0150 |
2020-02-18 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-02-11 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0150 |
2019-10-21 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-10-04 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-07-12 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-02-22 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0150 Published in the DC Register |
2019-02-19 | Council | Referred to Committee on Education |
2019-02-19 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |