DC B23-0127 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-22 - Act A23-0568 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001034
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-22 - Act A23-0568 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001034
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced it establishes a Board of Indeterminate Sentence and Parole for the District of Columbia and to determine its functions, and for other purposes, to include individuals who committed an offense before age 25 in the existing sentence modification process.
FUNDING NOTE - This bill is Subject to Appropriations. See Fiscal Impact Statement in "Other Documents".
Title
Second Look Amendment Act of 2019 (now known as "Omnibus Public Safety and Justice Amendment Act of 2020")
Sponsors
Cnc. Charles Allen [D] | Cnc. Jack Evans [D] | Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] |
Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. David Grosso [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] |
Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-12-15 - Council - Amendment #2 (M. Cheh) (Y: 0 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-12-15 - Council - Amendment #1 (M. Cheh) (Y: 0 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-12-15 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-12-01 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-12-01 - Council - Amendment (Cheh #2) (Y: 2 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-12-01 - Council - Amendment (Cheh #1) (Y: 2 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-12-15 - Council - Amendment #1 (M. Cheh) (Y: 0 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-12-15 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-12-01 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-12-01 - Council - Amendment (Cheh #2) (Y: 2 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-12-01 - Council - Amendment (Cheh #1) (Y: 2 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-22 | Council | Act A23-0568 Published in DC Register Vol 68 and Page 001034 |
2021-01-14 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2021-01-13 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0568 |
2020-12-29 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 13, 2021 |
2020-12-15 | Council | Amendment #2 (M. Cheh) |
2020-12-15 | Council | Amendment #1 (M. Cheh) |
2020-12-15 | Council | Final Reading |
2020-12-01 | Council | First Reading |
2020-12-01 | Council | Amendment (Cheh #2) |
2020-12-01 | Council | Amendment (Cheh #1) |
2020-11-24 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-11-23 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0127 |
2019-03-26 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-03-08 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-02-15 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0127 Published in the DC Register |
2019-02-05 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2019-02-05 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |