DC B23-0123 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-10 - Roundtable Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-10 - Roundtable Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced it requires the Mayor to provide information regarding all applications to the Housing Production Trust Fund, including data used to determine funding awards.
Title
Housing Production Trust Fund Transparency Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] | Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Jack Evans [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] |
Cnc. David Grosso [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] |
Cnc. Trayon White [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-10 | Council | Roundtable Hearing Held |
2019-06-21 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-06-17 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-05-17 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-05-03 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-04-26 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-02-15 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0123 Published in the DC Register |
2019-02-05 | Council | Referred to Committee on Housing and Neighborhood Revitalization |
2019-02-05 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B23-0123 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/41810/Introduction/B23-0123-Introduction.pdf |