DC B23-0110 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-06 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-06 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced it extends the deadline to terminate the Bryant Street Tax increment Financing Area from March 1, 2019 to March 1, 2020.
Title
Bryant Street Tax Increment Financing Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-06 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-12-13 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-04-05 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2019-03-19 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2019-02-08 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0110 Published in the DC Register |
2019-02-05 | Council | Referred to Committee on Finance and Revenue |
2019-01-31 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B23-0110 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/41781/Introduction/B23-0110-Introduction.pdf |