DC B23-0089 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-23 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-23 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced it establishes a health impact assessment program within the Department of Health to evaluate the potential health effects of proposed projects on individuals and communities. The health impact assessment shall include an advisory committee, procedures for taking public comment, and a procedure for enhanced public notification and involvement in developing community health awareness.
Title
Health Impact Assessment Program Establishment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Cnc. David Grosso [D] | Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] | Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] |
Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Charles Allen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-03-29 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-01-25 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0089 Published in the DC Register |
2019-01-22 | Council | Referred to Committee on Health |
2019-01-22 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B23-0089 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/41721/Introduction/B23-0089-Introduction.pdf |