DC B23-0076 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-05 - Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development
Pending: Council Business and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-05 - Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development
Pending: Council Business and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced it provides for a real property tax exemption for DC Pancakes, LLC, located at 3100 14th Street, N.W.
Title
14th Street International House of Pancakes Real Property Tax Exemption Act of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-05 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2019-03-19 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2019-01-25 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0076 Published in the DC Register |
2019-01-22 | Council | Referred to Committee on Finance and Revenue |
2019-01-17 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B23-0076 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/41705/Introduction/B23-0076-Introduction.pdf |