DC B23-0072 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-20 - Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development
Pending: Council Business and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-20 - Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development
Pending: Council Business and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
(RE-REFERRED)
(CORRECTION)
The Chairman is referring this legislation sequentially:
Sections 2, 3, 4, 5, and 10 are referred to the Committee on the Judiciary and Public Safety, and then to the Committee of the Whole.
Sections 2, 6, 7, 9 are referred to the Committee on Business and Economic Development and then to the Committee of the Whole.
Section 11 is referred to the Committee on the Judiciary and Public Safety, with comments from the Committee on Transportation and the Environment, and then to the Committee of the Whole.
The rest of the bill, including sections 8, 12 and 13, are referred to the Committee of the Whole.
As introduced Bill 23-72 establishes the licensing and regulation infrastructure for the production, sale, consumption, and testing of retail marijuana and retail marijuana-infused products. It establishes what actions involving marijuana shall not constitute a civil or criminal offense or be a basis for seizure or forfeiture of assets under District law. It also requires the Clerk of the Court to proactively expunge certain offenses and notify the person entitled to expungement, the prosecutor, pretrial, corrections and community supervision agencies of the expungement. It also establishes a dedicated marijuana fund, which shall consist of all sales tax and excise tax revenue from retail marijuana.
Title
Marijuana Legalization and Regulation Act of 2019
Sponsors
Cnc. David Grosso [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] |
Cnc. Jack Evans [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-20 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2019-09-17 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2019-01-25 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0072 Published in the DC Register |
2019-01-22 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2019-01-08 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B23-0072 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/41691/Introduction/B23-0072-Introduction.pdf |