DC B23-0060 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-20 - Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development
Pending: Council Business and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-20 - Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development
Pending: Council Business and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced it restores and expands the income tax exclusion for pensions, or military and retired pay and restores the deduction for long-term care insurance.
Title
Pension Exclusion Restoration and Expansion Act of 2019
Sponsors
Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] | Cnc. Trayon White [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] |
Cnc. Jack Evans [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Brandon Todd [D] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] |
Cnc. Charles Allen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-20 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2019-09-17 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2019-01-18 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0060 Published in the DC Register |
2019-01-08 | Council | Referred to Committee on Finance and Revenue |
2019-01-08 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B23-0060 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/41651/Introduction/B23-0060-Introduction.pdf |