DC B23-0059 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-20 - Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development
Pending: Council Business and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-20 - Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development
Pending: Council Business and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced Bill 23-59 excludes from gross income the amount received as annual salary by eligible District of Columbia government first responders.
Title
First Responder Income Tax Exclusion Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Robert White [D] | Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] |
Cnc. Jack Evans [D] | Cnc. Brandon Todd [D] | Cnc. David Grosso [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-20 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2019-09-17 | Council | Referred to Committee on Business and Economic Development |
2019-01-18 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0059 Published in the DC Register |
2019-01-08 | Council | Referred to Committee on Finance and Revenue |
2019-01-08 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B23-0059 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/41650/Introduction/B23-0059-Introduction.pdf |