DC B23-0034 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-21 - Law L23-0126, Effective from Aug 06, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 9842
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-21 - Law L23-0126, Effective from Aug 06, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 9842
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Law 23-126 prohibits the import, sale, offer for sale, purchase, barter, or possession with intent to sell ivory products and rhinoceros horn products.
FUNDING NOTE - This bill is Subject to Appropriations. See Fiscal Impact Statement in "Other Documents" tab.
See Bill 22-314 for legislative history.
Title
Elephant Ivory and Rhinoceros Horn Trafficking Prohibition Act of 2019 (aka "Ivory and Horn Trafficking Prohibition Act of 2020")
Sponsors
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] | Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Elissa Silverman [I] | Cnc. Brianne Nadeau [D] |
Cnc. Jack Evans [D] | Cnc. Trayon White [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-04-07 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-21 | Council | Law L23-0126, Effective from Aug 06, 2020 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 9842 |
2020-05-15 | Council | Act A23-0302 Published in DC Register Vol 67 and Page 5060 |
2020-05-12 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2020-05-05 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2020-04-27 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0302 |
2020-04-17 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on May 1, 2020 |
2020-04-07 | Council | Final Reading, CC |
2020-03-03 | Council | First Reading, CC |
2020-02-26 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2020-02-25 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0034 |
2019-01-18 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0034 Published in the DC Register |
2019-01-08 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2019-01-08 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |