DC B23-0021 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Law L23-0006, Effective from Jun 04, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 7059
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Law L23-0006, Effective from Jun 04, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 7059
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
LEGISLATIVE SUMMARY - Law 23-6 revises the existing exemption from real property taxes to provide a 20-year abatement of real property taxes on the property located in Lot 801, Square 643, Suffix S.
See Bill 22-915 for hearing information.
Title
Randall School Museum and Housing Development Real Property Tax Abatement Act of 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - Council - Amendment (Allen #1) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Council - Amendment (Allen #1) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Council - Amendment (Allen #2) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Council - Amendment (Allen #1) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Council - Amendment (Allen #2) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | Council | Law L23-0006, Effective from Jun 04, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 7059 |
2019-04-22 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2019-04-19 | Council | Act A23-0038 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 4944 |
2019-04-11 | Council | Returned from Mayor |
2019-04-10 | Council | Signed by the Mayor and Enacted with Act Number A23-0038 |
2019-04-04 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on April 19, 2019 |
2019-04-02 | Council | Final Reading |
2019-04-02 | Council | Amendment (Allen #2) |
2019-04-02 | Council | Amendment (Allen #1) |
2019-03-05 | Council | First Reading |
2019-02-13 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2019-02-13 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B23-0021 |
2019-01-22 | Council | Referred to Committee on Finance and Revenue |
2019-01-11 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0021 Published in the DC Register |
2019-01-07 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |