DC B23-0018 | 2019-2020 | 23rd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-03 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-03 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced it prohibits the registration and possession of ghost guns in the District of Columbia. Ghost guns are firearms that, after the removal of all parts other than a receiver, cannot be detected by a metal detector.
Title
Ghost Guns Prohibition Amendment Act of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-03 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2019-09-13 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-06-07 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2019-01-11 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B23-0018 Published in the DC Register |
2019-01-08 | Council | Referred to Committee on Judiciary and Public Safety |
2019-01-07 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B23-0018 |
Text | https://lims.dccouncil.gov/downloads/LIMS/41601/Introduction/B23-0018-Introduction.pdf |