DC B22-1059 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-11 - Act A22-0552, Expires on March 30, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 251
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-11 - Act A22-0552, Expires on March 30, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 251
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Fiscal Year 2019 Budget Support Clarification Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act Of 2018
Title
Fiscal Year 2019 Budget Support Clarification Congressional Review Emergency Amendment Act Of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-18 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-11 | Council | Act A22-0552, Expires on March 30, 2019 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 251 |
2018-12-31 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0552 |
2018-12-31 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0552 |
2018-12-26 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 10, 2019 |
2018-12-18 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-12-18 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2018-12-13 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |