DC B22-0997 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-11 - Act A22-0547 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 219
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-11 - Act A22-0547 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 219
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Fiscal Year 2019 Budget Support Clarification Amendment Act Of 2018
Title
Fiscal Year 2019 Budget Support Clarification Amendment Act Of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-04 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-20 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-20 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-11 | Council | Act A22-0547 Published in DC Register Vol 66 and Page 219 |
2019-01-09 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is February 26, 2019 |
2018-12-26 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0547 |
2018-12-26 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0547 |
2018-12-13 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on December 28, 2018 |
2018-12-04 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-11-27 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-11-20 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0997 |
2018-11-20 | Council | First Reading CC |
2018-10-16 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2018-10-12 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0997 Published in the DC Register |
2018-10-02 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |