DC B22-0986 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-18 - Signed with Act Number A22-0589
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-18 - Signed with Act Number A22-0589
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill authorizes the issuance of tax increment financing to support certain infrastructure and site costs for a portion of the land located among the existing Brookland Manor apartment complex and the former Brentwood Village Shopping Center along Rhode Island Ave NW in Ward 5.
FUNDING NOTE - This law is Subject to Appropriations. See Fiscal Impact Statement in "Other Documents" tab.
Title
Rhode Island Avenue (ria) Tax Increment Financing Act Of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-18 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-27 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-27 - Council - First Reading (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-18 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0589 |
2019-01-18 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0589 |
2019-01-03 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 18, 2019 |
2018-12-18 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-11-27 | Council | First Reading |
2018-11-20 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-11-20 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0986 |
2018-11-14 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-10-26 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-10-05 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0986 Published in the DC Register |
2018-10-02 | Council | Referred to Committee on Finance and Revenue |
2018-10-01 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |