DC B22-0960 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on January 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-18 - Signed with Act Number A22-0587
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on January 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-18 - Signed with Act Number A22-0587
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill requires health care facilities to notify patients of mammogram results tending to show high breast density in the summary of the mammography report. It provides specific language to be included in notices regarding category C or D Breast Tissue Classifications. Among other things, it requires insurers to cover certain health-care services without cost-sharing and requires certain information be provided to potential enrollees and enrollees.
Title
Breast Density Screening And Notification Act Of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-04 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-13 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-13 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-18 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0587 |
2019-01-18 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0587 |
2019-01-03 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 18, 2019 |
2018-12-04 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-11-13 | Council | First Reading CC |
2018-11-07 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-11-01 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0960 |
2018-10-26 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-10-05 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-09-28 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0960 Published in the DC Register |
2018-09-18 | Council | Referred to Committee on Health |
2018-09-18 | Council | Introduced in Committee of the Whole |