DC B22-0958 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on September 18 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-12-03 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, this bill establishes a baby-proofing home modification grant program to aid qualified residents with the cost of improving the safety and well-being of infants and toddlers at home called the Babies Safe at Home Program, to be administered by the Department of Housing and Community Development.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Babies Safe At Home Act Of 2018

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-03CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2018-11-16CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2018-09-28CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B22-0958 Published in the DC Register
2018-09-18CouncilReferred to Committee on Housing and Neighborhood Revitalization
2018-09-18CouncilIntroduced in Committee of the Whole

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback