DC B22-0913 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-27 - Committee Report Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-27 - Committee Report Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Law 22-196 repealS Initiative 77 which would have established a universal minimum wage for tipped workers. It continued the status quo for tipped employees, prior to Initiative 77, but also provided for new workplace protections.
FUNDING NOTE - This law is Subject to Appropriations. See Fiscal Impact Statement in "Other Documents" tab.
Title
Tipped Wage Workers Fairness Amendment Act Of 2018
Sponsors
Cnc. Phil Mendelson [D] | Cnc. Vincent Gray [D] | Cnc. Brandon Todd [D] | Cnc. Trayon White [D] |
Cnc. Anita Bonds [D] | Cnc. Jack Evans [D] | Cnc. Kenyan McDuffie [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-10-16 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-16 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-16 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-02 - Council - First Reading (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-16 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-16 - Council - Amendment (Mendelson) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-02 - Council - First Reading (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-27 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-12-21 | Council | Law Number L22-0196 Effective from December 13, 2018 |
2018-11-02 | Council | Act A22-0489 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 12049 |
2018-10-30 | Council | Transmitted to Congress |
2018-10-23 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0489 |
2018-10-23 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0489 |
2018-10-22 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on November 5, 2018 |
2018-10-16 | Council | Amendment in the Nature of a Substitute (Mendelson) |
2018-10-16 | Council | Amendment (Mendelson) |
2018-10-16 | Council | Final Reading |
2018-10-02 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0913 |
2018-10-02 | Council | First Reading |
2018-09-17 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-08-03 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-07-20 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0913 Published in the DC Register |
2018-07-10 | Council | Referred to Committee on Committee of the Whole |
2018-07-09 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |