DC B22-0870 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-27 - Act A22-0420, Expires on October 17, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 7695
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-27 - Act A22-0420, Expires on October 17, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 7695
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Southwest Waterfront Parking Enforcement Emergency Act Of 2018
Title
Southwest Waterfront Parking Enforcement Emergency Act Of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-26 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-27 | Council | Act A22-0420, Expires on October 17, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 7695 |
2018-07-19 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0420 |
2018-07-19 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0420 |
2018-07-10 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2018-07-09 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 23, 2018 |
2018-06-26 | Council | Final Reading |
2018-06-26 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |