DC B22-0852 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-27 - Act A22-0422, Expires on October 18, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 7699
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-27 - Act A22-0422, Expires on October 18, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 7699
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Third Amendment To The Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority Capital Funding Agreement Emergency Act Of 2018
Title
Third Amendment To The Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority Capital Funding Agreement Emergency Act Of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-26 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-27 | Council | Act A22-0422, Expires on October 18, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 7699 |
2018-07-20 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0422 |
2018-07-20 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0422 |
2018-07-09 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on July 23, 2018 |
2018-06-26 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-06-26 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2018-06-19 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |