DC B22-0830 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Act A22-0388, Expires on September 20, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 7011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Act A22-0388, Expires on September 20, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 7011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Anacostia River Toxics Remediation Emergency Amendment Act Of 2018
Title
Anacostia River Toxics Remediation Emergency Amendment Act Of 2018
Sponsors
Cnc. Mary Cheh [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-05 - Council - Final Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-29 | Council | Act A22-0388, Expires on September 20, 2018 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 7011 |
2018-06-22 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0388 |
2018-06-22 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0388 |
2018-06-12 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2018-06-11 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on June 25, 2018 |
2018-06-05 | Council | Final Reading |
2018-06-04 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |