DC B22-0789 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-19 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 12 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-11-19 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill provides real property tax relief for Lot 826 in Square 6129 and Lot 804 in Square 5984, owned by Unfoldment Inc.
Title
Unfoldment, Inc. Real Property Tax Relief Act Of 2018
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-19 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-11-02 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-04-20 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0789 Published in the DC Register |
2018-04-17 | Council | Referred to Committee on Finance and Revenue |
2018-04-12 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |
Washington D.C. State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Legislation/B22-0789 |
Text | http://lims.dccouncil.gov/Download/40041/B22-0789-Introduction.pdf |