DC B22-0686 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on January 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-24 - Signed with Act Number A22-0596
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on January 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-24 - Signed with Act Number A22-0596
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, this bill requires the Office on Aging to develop a comprehensive ten year strategic plan that shall serve as a long-term blueprint for the District. The plan includes an assessment of the data currently available on the District's senior population, the senior populations' needs, and the growth and decline in diversity of the senior population, among other things.
FUNDING NOTE - This law is Subject to Appropriations. See Fiscal Impact Statement in "Other Documents" tab.
Title
Senior Strategic Plan Amendment Act Of 2018
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-18 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-04 - Council - First Reading CC (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-24 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0596 |
2019-01-24 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0596 |
2019-01-10 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on January 28, 2019 |
2018-12-18 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-12-04 | Council | First Reading CC |
2018-11-28 | Council | Committee Report Filed |
2018-11-28 | Council | Committee Mark-up of B22-0686 |
2018-11-02 | Council | Public Hearing Held |
2018-10-12 | Council | Notice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register |
2018-02-09 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0686 Published in the DC Register |
2018-02-06 | Council | Referred to Committee on Housing and Neighborhood Revitalization |
2018-02-06 | Council | Introduced in Legislative Meeting |