DC B22-0667 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-06 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, this bill creates a nonrefundable individual income tax credit for charitable donations in support of public education in the District of Columbia. It also establishes the District of Columbia Public Education Investment Fund. Money deposited in the fund shall be used for public education in the District of Columbia.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

District Of Columbia Education Charitable Donations Amendment Act Of 2018

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-06CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2018-06-01CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2018-01-26CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B22-0667 Published in the DC Register
2018-01-23CouncilReferred to Committee on Finance and Revenue
2018-01-23CouncilIntroduced in Committee of the Whole

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback