DC B22-0654 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-10-10 - Public Hearing Held
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, this bill establishes criteria for determining when property is abandoned, and requires notice to apparent owners of such property. It establishes how the District's Administrator of Unclaimed Property (Administrator) shall take custody, sell, and administer such property and how claims are established to recover property from the Administrator. It also addresses the confidentiality of information among other things.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Uniform Unclaimed Property Act Revision Act Of 2018

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-10CouncilPublic Hearing Held
2018-09-21CouncilNotice of Public Hearing Published in the DC Register
2018-01-12CouncilNotice of Intent to Act on B22-0654 Published in the DC Register
2018-01-09CouncilReferred to Committee on Finance and Revenue
2018-01-05CouncilIntroduced in Office of the Secretary

Washington D.C. State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback