DC B22-0627 | 2017-2018 | 22nd Council
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is February 26, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is February 26, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revised Synthetics Abatement And Full Enforcement Drug Control Temporary Amendment Act Of 2017
Title
Revised Synthetics Abatement And Full Enforcement Drug Control Temporary Amendment Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-10-16 - Council - Final Reading CC (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-02 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of Substitute (Allen) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-02 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-02 - Council - Amendment in the Nature of Substitute (Allen) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-02 - Council - First Reading (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Council | Transmitted to Congress, Projected Law Date is February 26, 2019 |
2018-11-09 | Council | Act A22-0503 Published in DC Register Vol 65 and Page 12338 |
2018-10-31 | Council | Signed with Act Number A22-0503 |
2018-10-31 | Council | Enacted with Act Number A22-0503 |
2018-10-23 | Council | Transmitted to Mayor, Response Due on November 6, 2018 |
2018-10-16 | Council | Final Reading CC |
2018-10-05 | Council | Notice of Intent to Act on B22-0627 Published in the DC Register |
2018-10-02 | Council | First Reading |
2018-10-02 | Council | Amendment in the Nature of Substitute (Allen) |
2017-12-19 | Council | Retained by the Council |
2017-12-11 | Council | Introduced in Office of the Secretary |